U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00297
  • Case Name: Howerton v. POLARIS INC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Joinder]
  • April 21, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 21, 2025: [Complaint, Amended]
  • April 21, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 21, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 19, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.