U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-11062
  • Case Name: Erica Najuana Coleman
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Submission of Tax Documents for Trustee]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Certificate of Service]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate (eFinCert)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice to Correct - Virtual Entry]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Order for Wage Deduction]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 (Auto Assignment)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Notice of Hearing Set]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (USPCI ADI)]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Extend or Impose the Automatic Stay (Motion to)]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Extend or Impose the Automatic Stay (Motion to)]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Submission of Tax Documents for Trustee]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Debtor Atty Fees (Chp 13 ONLY and ONLY for INITIAL FEES)]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Submission of Tax Documents for Trustee]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Debtor Atty Fees (Chp 13 ONLY and ONLY for INITIAL FEES)]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Request for Wage Deduction Order]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Submission of Payment Advices for Trustee]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers (Official Form 121)]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Request for Wage Deduction Order]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Submission of Payment Advices for Trustee]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers (Official Form 121)]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Debtor]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Debtor]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.