U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00018-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Alsahqani, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 25, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • April 24, 2025: [Detain]
  • April 24, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Arrest - Other District]
  • April 24, 2025: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 24, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 23, 2025: [Detain]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 22, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 21, 2025: [Unseal Case]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.