U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00306
  • Case Name: Faulkner University v. National Association of Intercollegiate Athletics et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Oral Argument]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • April 28, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 27, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 26, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response to Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • April 25, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 25, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 25, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 25, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.