U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-01234-7
  • Case Name: Derrica Demondria Starks
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bulgarella, Joseph E [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bulgarella, Joseph E [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bulgarella, Joseph E [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bulgarella, Joseph E [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bulgarella, Joseph E [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bulgarella, Joseph E [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset-Auto Assign)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bulgarella, Joseph E [Incorrect Event (Non-Payment of Filing Fees)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bulgarella, Joseph E [Appointing Trustee]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bulgarella, Joseph E [Employee Income Records]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bulgarella, Joseph E [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bulgarella, Joseph E [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bulgarella, Joseph E [Social Security-Form B121]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.