U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-01244-13
  • Case Name: Kevin L. Loggins and Tammy B. Loggins
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Payment of Fee (Full Filing Fee, Installment Payment, Reopen)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Certificate of Service (Supplemental per LR 3015-1(c))]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assign)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Notice of Hearing - Van002]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Notice to Show Cause]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Order Denying Application for Payment of Filing Fees in Installments (Non-image)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Notes Public]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Affidavit]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Social Security-Form B121]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Caraway, Bradford W. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.