U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40560-11
  • Case Name: Robert Paul Johnson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gore, (SBRA) Linda B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gore, (SBRA) Linda B. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gore, (SBRA) Linda B. [Status Report]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gore, (SBRA) Linda B. [Statement]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gore, (SBRA) Linda B. [Tax Documents]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gore, (SBRA) Linda B. [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gore, (SBRA) Linda B. [Chapter 11 Operating Order]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gore, (SBRA) Linda B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gore, (SBRA) Linda B. [Memorandum]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gore, (SBRA) Linda B. [Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gore, (SBRA) Linda B. [Order and Notice of Status Conference]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order and Notice of Status Conference]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gore, (SBRA) Linda B. [Notice and Order]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice and Order]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gore, (SBRA) Linda B. [Incorrect Event (Notice of)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Incorrect Event (Notice of)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gore, (SBRA) Linda B. [Document]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gore, (SBRA) Linda B. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gore, (SBRA) Linda B. [Tax Documents]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Tax Documents]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gore, (SBRA) Linda B. [Employ - Application]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ - Application]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employee Income Records]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appraisal]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Social Security-Form B121]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.