U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40561-7
  • Case Name: Joseph Brian Lemonds
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Amended Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Notice to Show Cause]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Notice of Hearing - (Van020 Enter Matter)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Incorrect Event (Notice of)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset-Auto Assign)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Appointing Trustee]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Employee Income Records]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Statement of Intent]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Schedules A-J]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Matrix Filed]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Social Security-Form B121]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leo, Rocco J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.