U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-11140
  • Case Name: Jason Brent Creel and Stephanie Nicole Creel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Order for Wage Deduction]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Submission of Documents for Trustee]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Submission of Payment Advices for Trustee]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Joint Debtor]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Debtor]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Notice to Debtor(s) of Incomplete Filing(s)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 (Auto Assignment)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers (Official Form 121)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers (Official Form 121)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Request for Wage Deduction Order]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Request for Wage Deduction Order]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Debtor Atty Fees (Chp 13 ONLY and ONLY for INITIAL FEES)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Debtor Atty Fees (Chp 13 ONLY and ONLY for INITIAL FEES)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Conte, Christopher [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.