U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-00121
  • Case Name: Brian Lee Price and Deanna Lynn Price
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Intent to Enter Chapter 13 Discharge]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1 (g)]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment - 3002.1(f)]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Change of Address for Creditor]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
June, 2018
  • June 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • June 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Order Due (Sets and Removes OrderDue Flag)]
  • June 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • June 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)]
  • June 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • June 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • May 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COA)]
  • May 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13)]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing]
  • April 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline]
  • April 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • April 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certification of Domestic Support Payments]
  • April 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
  • April 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)]
  • April 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • April 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)]
  • April 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)]
  • April 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Schedules A-J]
  • April 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)]
  • April 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)]
  • April 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • April 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Appointment of Trustee]
  • April 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • April 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • April 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • April 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (BNC Notice)]
  • April 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)]
  • April 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • April 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
  • April 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
  • April 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • April 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • April 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • April 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • April 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • April 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Petition Review Completed]
  • April 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • April 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • April 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
  • April 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.