U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 12-00186
  • Case Name: Todd Christopher Aumick
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Account and Distribution Report (TDR)]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Approving Final Report Before Distribution (SA)]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of No Objection]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Trustees Final Report and Application for Compensation (NFR) (CM43-COAwith)]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Trustees Final Report (TFR)]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Compensation / Professional Fees]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of Service of Prompt Determination of Tax Liability]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Add Party]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Employ]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Employ (CM41)]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Compensation / Professional Fees]
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Approve Settlement]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of No Objection]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Non-Opposition]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Approve Settlement (Not Rule 9019)]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • October 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Employ]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Declaration]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Employ (CM41)]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Abandon]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Shorten Time]
  • September 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of No Objection]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)]
  • August 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [QC Remark Re: Incorrect Image]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Update Debtor Information]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Change of Address]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • August 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Abandon (Fee) (CM10)]
  • August 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • August 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice to File Proof of Claim]
  • August 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice to File Proof of Claim (BNC Notice)]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only)]
  • July 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Asset Determination (BKTR01)]
  • July 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • July 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of No Objection]
June, 2017
  • June 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • June 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Withdraw As Attorney (MUST be Titled MOTION & submit an order - if not see Notice events)]
  • May 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Appointment of Trustee]
  • May 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (BNC Notice)]
  • May 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Clerks Notice of Deferred Fees]
  • May 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Compton(7), Larry D. [Clerks Notice of Deferred Fees]
  • May 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • May 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Compton(7), Larry D. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • May 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Appointing Trustee]
  • May 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Compton(7), Larry D. [Appointing Trustee]
  • May 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Defer Fee]
  • May 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Reopen Chapter 7 Case]
  • May 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Compton(7), Larry D. [Defer Fee]
  • May 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Compton(7), Larry D. [Reopen Chapter 7 Case]
  • May 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Reassigning Judge (SA)]
  • May 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Compton(7), Larry D. [Reassigning Judge (SA)]
  • May 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Compton(7), Larry D. [Appoint Trustee (CM05)]
  • May 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Compton(7), Larry D. [Defer Fee (use Waive Filing Fee for Ch 7 IFP)]
  • May 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Compton(7), Larry D. [Reopen Chapter 7 Case (Fee) (CM20)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.