U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-00208
  • Case Name: Gary Lloyd Mayo
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • September 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • September 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only)]
  • June 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • June 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • June 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Appointment of Trustee]
  • June 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (BNC Notice)]
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Petition Review Completed]
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
  • June 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certification of Domestic Support Payments]
  • June 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certification of Domestic Support Payments]
  • June 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)]
  • June 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)]
  • June 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • June 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • June 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • June 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.