U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-00235
  • Case Name: Thomas Lee Fish
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Relief from Stay]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • October 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of No Objection]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Informational Reaffirmation Entry By Counsel (paperless event)]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)]
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only)]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • July 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail)]
  • July 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Letter]
  • July 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • July 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • July 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • July 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • July 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Appointment of Trustee]
  • July 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (BNC Notice)]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.