U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-00245
  • Case Name: Theodore Allen Willoya
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • November 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)]
October, 2017
  • October 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)]
  • October 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)]
  • October 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Amended Schedules D E/F (Fee)]
  • October 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)]
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)]
  • October 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only)]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • July 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • July 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • July 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • July 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Appointment of Trustee]
  • July 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (BNC Notice)]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Petition Review Completed]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Petition Review Completed]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.