U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-00293
  • Case Name: Christopher Mark Glanzer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Withdrawal of Document / Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)]
  • June 17, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • June 16, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Extend Time]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • May 26, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • March 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)]
  • March 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13)]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)]
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline]
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)]
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certification of Domestic Support Payments]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Extend Time]
  • January 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Withdrawal of Document / Motion]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Converting Case to Chapter 11/12/13 (BKCONV01-COAfter) (SA)]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Converting Case to Chapter 11/12/13 (BKCONV01-COAfter) (SA)]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of No Objection]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • December 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Voluntary Conversion From Chapter 7 to Chapter 13 ]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [QC Remark (generic)]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Generic Motion / Application]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Hearing]
  • October 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Declaration]
  • October 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Dismiss Case for Abuse (Under 11 USC 707(b)) (CM13)]
  • October 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - USTs Statement of Presumed Abuse]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Statement of Presumed Abuse (ST1) (BNC Notice)]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only)]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
  • August 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • August 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • August 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Appointment of Trustee]
  • August 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (BNC Notice)]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Petition Review Completed]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.