U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-00315
  • Case Name: Mary F Reeve
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only)]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo)]
September, 2017
  • September 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • September 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • September 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Appointment of Trustee]
  • September 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (BNC Notice)]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Petition Review Completed]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Petition Review Completed]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.