U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-00347
  • Case Name: Susan Denise Brewer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)]
December, 2017
  • December 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Avoid Lien]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only)]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of No Objection]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Avoid Lien (CM07)]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Appointment of Trustee]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (BNC Notice)]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Petition Review Completed]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.