U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-00357
  • Case Name: Stephanie N Feris
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • February 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Update Matrix]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Change of Address]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only)]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
November, 2017
  • November 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Vacating Order (SA)]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Calendar Remark (Settled / Removed)]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Withdrawal of Document / Motion]
  • November 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Show Cause (with hrg) (SA)]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo)]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [OSC Referral]
  • November 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • November 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)]
  • November 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Schedules A-J]
  • November 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Extend Time]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Extend Time]
October, 2017
  • October 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • October 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • October 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Appointment of Trustee]
  • October 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Terminate Deadline]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (BNC Notice)]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Petition Review Completed]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.