U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-00369
  • Case Name: Emily B. Hall
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only)]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Schedules A-J]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Appointment of Trustee]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (BNC Notice)]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Petition Review Completed]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • October 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • October 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • October 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • October 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.