U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 12-00299
  • Case Name: Harris Yang
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barstow, William M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barstow, William M. [Avoid Lien]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barstow, William M. [Certificate of No Objection]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barstow, William M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barstow, William M. [Certificate of No Objection]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barstow, William M. [Support Documentation]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barstow, William M. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barstow, William M. [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barstow, William M. [Avoid Lien (CM07)]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barstow, William M. [Generic Motion]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barstow, William M. [Affidavit]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barstow, William M. [Generic Motion / Application]
  • December 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barstow, William M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barstow, William M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barstow, William M. [Avoid Lien]
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barstow, William M. [Reassigning Judge (SA)]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barstow, William M. [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barstow, William M. [Certificate of No Objection]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barstow, William M. [Original Signature Submitted]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barstow, William M. [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barstow, William M. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barstow, William M. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barstow, William M. [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barstow, William M. [Avoid Lien (CM07)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.