U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-00374
  • Case Name: Pamela Harben Littlejohn
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • October 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Discharging Debtor(s) - Ch 7, Ch 12 & Ch 13 Standard (SA) (BNC Notice)]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Intent to Enter Chapter 13 Discharge]
  • September 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Change of Address for Creditor]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Amend]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Amend]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Relief from Stay]
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certificate of No Objection]
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Update Debtor Information]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Change of Address]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Transfer of Claim Fee Paid]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certification of Domestic Support Payments]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13)]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Update Matrix]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Change of Address for Creditor]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo)]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
  • November 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • November 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Appointment of Trustee]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (BNC Notice)]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.