U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-00425
  • Case Name: Phillip Lee Barnard
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds (BKTR01) ]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines)]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)]
  • February 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Dismissing Case (SA)]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo)]
  • January 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)]
December, 2017
  • December 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Vacating Order (SA)]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Statement of Military Service (Form B2020)]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Schedules A-J]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [OSC Referral]
  • December 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • December 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • December 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Appointment of Trustee]
  • December 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (BNC Notice)]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance)]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.