U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-00424
  • Case Name: Heather Ossig and Brian Ossig
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines)]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13)]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certificate of No Objection]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Vacating Order (SA)]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Calendar Remark (Objection Withdrawn)]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Withdrawal of Document / Motion]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certification of Domestic Support Payments]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance)]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings)]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Update Hearing for JRP / Calendar]
February, 2018
  • February 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)]
  • February 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)]
  • February 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)]
  • February 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Generic Motion / Application]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo)]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice to Individual Consumer Debtors (Form B201)]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Creditor Matrix (Only Use When PDF Image Omitted From Petition - Not An Amended Matrix)]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Schedules A-J]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)]
  • January 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance)]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [OSC Referral]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
December, 2017
  • December 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Non-Compliance (LBF37)]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)]
  • December 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • December 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Appointment of Trustee]
  • December 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • December 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (BNC Notice)]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.