U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-90084
  • Case Name: McGuire et al v. Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency et
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • March 26, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 24, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment of Dismissal (Adversary Cases) (SA)]
  • March 19, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Case (No Hrg Rqd for Ch 13, Hrg Rqd for Ch 7,11,12 - FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM15)]
February, 2020
  • February 23, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 21, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Party (DO NOT Use to Dismiss Debtor) (SA)]
  • February 21, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Proceeding Memo]
  • February 20, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • February 19, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Trial Brief]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Proceeding Memo]
  • December 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Audio File (Active Event)]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Setting Hearing (SA)]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Case Status Report]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • June 28, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Proceeding Memo]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • March 14, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Proceeding Memo]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Audio File (Active Event)]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Proceeding Memo]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • December 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Proceeding Memo]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • November 15, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Proceeding Memo]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • September 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Proceeding Memo]
  • September 04, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Audio File (Active Event)]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Proceeding Memo]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Setting Hearing (SA)]
  • June 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • June 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Setting Hearing (SA)]
  • June 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Proceeding Memo]
May, 2018
  • May 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Amended Complaint (APSANS01)]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Add Party]
  • April 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
  • April 10, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)]
  • April 08, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
  • April 02, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines)]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Setting Hearing (SA)]
  • March 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • March 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Proceeding Memo]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice - Scheduling and Planning Conference]
  • February 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Setting Scheduling and Planning Conference (Adv. Cases - Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)]
  • February 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint (APANS01)]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Terminate Deadline]
  • January 29, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 29, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Involuntary Petition (CM49-COAwith)]
  • January 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • January 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 09, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)]
December, 2017
  • December 16, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 15, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • December 15, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Adversary Review Completed]
  • December 15, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [QC Remark (generic)]
  • December 14, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Unexecuted]
  • December 14, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.