U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-00427
  • Case Name: Peter Noel McGlashan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Change of Address for Creditor]
  • January 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • January 28, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Discharging Debtor(s) - Ch 7, Ch 12 & Ch 13 Standard (SA) (BNC Notice)]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Terminate Attorney]
  • December 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Substitution of Attorney]
  • December 27, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Intent to Enter Chapter 13 Discharge]
  • December 27, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
  • December 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims]
  • December 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1 (g)]
  • October 27, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment - 3002.1(f)]
  • October 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Update Matrix]
  • January 05, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Change of Address for Creditor]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Transfer of Claim Fee Paid]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines)]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
  • March 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Claims (SA)]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Order to be Excepted from Electronic Filing]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Excepted from Electronic Filing]
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Order (Generic) (SA)]
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certificate of No Objection]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13)]
  • January 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Affidavit of Service]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certification of Domestic Support Payments]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Schedules A-J]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)]
  • December 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing]
  • December 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • December 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Appointment of Trustee]
  • December 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • December 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (BNC Notice)]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.