U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-00430
  • Case Name: Michael Craig Purviance
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Account and Distribution Report (TDR)]
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Trustees Final Account and Distribution Report (TDR)]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines)]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Dismiss Case]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Dismiss Case (Hrg Rqd for Ch 7,11,12 - FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM15)]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Request for Special Notice]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 12 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13)]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Schedules A-J]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Extend Time]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 12 (Individual / Joint, Family Farmer) (BNC Notice)]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 12) (BNC Notice)]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (BNC Notice)]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Terminate Deadline]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Petition Review Completed]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.