U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-00432
  • Case Name: Karl Robert Main
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of No Objection]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Order to be Excepted from Electronic Filing]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only)]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)]
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Excepted from Electronic Filing]
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (BNC Notice)]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.