U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-00436
  • Case Name: Kenneth Eugene Vehmeier
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)]
  • April 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines)]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Generic Motion / Application]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Chambers Template-BNC Notice)]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only)]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Update Matrix]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice Request]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • December 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • December 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (BNC Notice)]
  • December 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • December 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • December 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • December 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • December 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.