U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-00439
  • Case Name: Gordon A. Parker, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only)]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo)]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Schedules A-J]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (BNC Notice)]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • December 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [OSC Referral Re: Statement of Social Security (Form 121)]
  • December 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [OSC Referral Re: Statement of Social Security (Form 121)]
  • December 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees]
  • December 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees]
  • December 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • December 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Terminate Deadline]
  • December 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • December 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.