U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-00440
  • Case Name: Devin Ray Martin and Brittany Jean Martin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only)]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Relief from Stay]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of No Objection]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (BNC Notice)]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.