U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-00443
  • Case Name: Jeannette Marie Sleppy and John Milton Sleppy
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 06, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Account and Distribution Report (TDR)]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Approving Final Report Before Distribution (SA)]
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of No Objection]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 31, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Trustees Final Report and Application for Compensation (NFR) (CM43-COAwith)]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Trustees Final Report (TFR)]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Report of Sale]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Compensation / Professional Fees]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Transfer of Claim Fee Paid]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Approve Settlement / Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of No Objection]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Approve Settlement / Compromise Under Rule 9019 (Re Estate - By Trustee or DIP Only) (CM36)]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Employ]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Declaration]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Employ (CM41)]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines)]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Rescission of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Update Matrix]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Change of Address]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Chambers Template-BNC Notice)]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice to File Proof of Claim]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice to File Proof of Claim (BNC Notice)]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Asset Determination (BKTR01)]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only)]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • January 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Letter From State Court Re: Stayed Case]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
December, 2017
  • December 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • December 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • December 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (BNC Notice)]
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Petition Review Completed]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.