U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-00003
  • Case Name: Glen Ross Harrington and Sherry Ann Harrington
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only)]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Terminate Deadline]
  • January 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)]
  • January 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)]
  • January 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Schedules A-J]
  • January 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)]
  • January 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice to Individual Consumer Debtors (Form B201)]
  • January 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)]
  • January 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • January 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • January 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • January 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • January 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (BNC Notice)]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Petition Review Completed]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Terminate Deadline]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Creditor Matrix (Only Use When PDF Image Omitted From Petition - Not An Amended Matrix)]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.