U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-00041
  • Case Name: Daniel Jay Yang and Laurie Kyong Yang
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Relief from Stay]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of No Objection]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Generic Motion / Application]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Relief from Stay]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of No Objection]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Terminate Deadline]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only)]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Generic Motion]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Generic Motion / Application]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Request for Special Notice]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Update Matrix]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice Request]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Petition Review Completed]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Petition Review Completed]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.