U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-00043
  • Case Name: Terry Lee Sanders
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Account and Distribution Report (TDR)]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Approving Final Report Before Distribution (SA)]
  • June 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of No Objection]
  • June 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 02, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Trustees Final Report and Application for Compensation (NFR) (CM43-COAwith)]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Trustees Final Report (TFR)]
  • May 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Compensation / Professional Fees]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Compensation]
  • April 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of No Objection]
  • April 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Service of Prompt Determination of Tax Liability]
  • April 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Employ]
  • April 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Employ (CM41)]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Compensation / Professional Fees]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Report of Sale]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Sell Property (Under Sec 363(b))]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Employ]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of No Objection]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Terminate Deadline]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Sell Property (Sec 363(b) - NOT Free & Clear) (CM22)]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Employ (CM41)]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Employ]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Employ (CM41)]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice to File Proof of Claim]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice to File Proof of Claim (BNC Notice)]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Asset Determination (BKTR01)]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only)]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • February 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • February 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • February 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Petition Review Completed]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Petition Review Completed]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.