U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-00415
  • Case Name: Hook Line & Sinker, Inc
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Close BK Case Utility (See Final Decree for Regular BK Closings)]
  • September 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree (Order from Judge) (SA)]
  • September 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Entry of Final Decree]
  • September 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of No Objection]
  • September 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Monthly Operating Report]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Non-Opposition]
  • August 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • August 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Entry of Final Decree]
  • August 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic) (SA)]
  • August 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Monthly Operating Report]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Postconfirmation Progress Report]
  • July 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Monthly Operating Report]
June, 2019
  • June 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Monthly Operating Report]
  • June 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of No Objection]
May, 2019
  • May 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Compensation / Professional Fees]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Compensation / Professional Fees]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Monthly Operating Report]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order to Allow Filing of Late Filed Claim]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Confirming Chapter 11 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (SA)]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Ballots]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Support Documentation]
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)]
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Ballots]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Chapter 11 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Update Deadline / Hearing (Plan or Disclosure Statement)]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Setting Hearing (SA)]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • April 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Monthly Operating Report]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings)]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Setting Hearing (SA)]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic) (SA)]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Supplement To Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Monthly Operating Report]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Setting Hearing (SA)]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Continue / Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Continue / Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Ballots]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Trial Brief]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • February 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • February 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employ (CM41)]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Terminate Attorney]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing on Disclosure / Confirmation (SA)]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Monthly Operating Report]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Chapter 11 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Ballots]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Supplement to Disclosure Statement]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Non-Opposition]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Disclosure Statement]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Errata]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure Statement]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Supplement to Disclosure Statement]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Chapter 11 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Allow Filing of Late Filed Claim (CM02)]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Setting Hearing (SA)]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Update Deadline (Objections - all types)]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion / Application]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion / Application]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)]
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Ballots]
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)]
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
  • January 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Approve Settlement (Not Rule 9019)]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Chapter 11 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Ballots]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion / Application]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [QC Remark Re: Incorrect Image]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)]
  • January 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Monthly Operating Report]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Approve Settlement (Not Rule 9019)]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing on Disclosure / Confirmation (SA)]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure Statement]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Compensation (SA)]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)]
  • December 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Monthly Operating Report]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Non-Opposition]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
  • December 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims]
  • December 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Continue / Reschedule Hearing]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Disclosure Statement]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion / Application]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Ballots]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Disclosure Statement]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Transfer of Claim Fee Paid]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [QC Remark (generic)]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of No Objection]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • November 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Monthly Operating Report]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing on Disclosure / Confirmation (SA)]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Approve Settlement / Compromise Under Rule 9019 (Re Estate - By Trustee or DIP Only) (CM36)]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certification]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure Statement]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Chapter 11 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Compensation / Professional Fees]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Compensation / Professional Fees]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Monthly Operating Report]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Borrow]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of No Objection]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appointment of Creditors Committee (BKCR01)]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Monthly Operating Report]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Limit Notice]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Borrow]
  • September 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic) (SA)]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Assume / Reject Lease or Executory Contract]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of No Objection]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document / Motion]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic) (SA)]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document / Motion]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of No Objection]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Monthly Operating Report]
  • August 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document / Motion]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure Statement]
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Chapter 11 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • July 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of No Objection]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Continue / Reschedule Hearing]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • July 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Monthly Operating Report]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion / Application]
  • July 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Non-Opposition]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Setting Hearing (SA)]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Setting Hearing (SA)]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Continue / Reschedule Hearing]
  • June 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)]
  • June 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • June 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Compensation / Professional Fees]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing on Disclosure / Confirmation (SA)]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion / Application]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certification]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure Statement]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Assume / Reject Lease or Executory Contract (CM06 or CM19)]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules D E/F (Fee)]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Monthly Operating Report]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Creditor Matrix AND Amended Schedules (Fee)]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Add Party]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic) (SA)]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202)]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules D E/F (Fee)]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Order (SA)]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • May 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Monthly Operating Report]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Case Status Report]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Joinder]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • April 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic) (SA)]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Claim]
  • April 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Monthly Operating Report]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13)]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Creditor Matrix AND Amended Schedules (Fee)]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Pay]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order on Application to Employ Nunc Pro Tunc]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employ Nunc Pro Tunc (CM41)]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order on Application to Employ Nunc Pro Tunc]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Monthly Operating Report]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion / Application]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral (CM04)]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Intent to Take Compensation]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Schedule H (Form 106H & 206H)]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Schedule G (Form 106G & 206G)]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Schedule E/F (Form 106E/F & 206E/F)]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Schedule D (Form 106D & 206D)]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Schedule A/B (Form 106A/B & 206A/B)]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • March 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appointment of Creditors Committee (BKCR01)]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines)]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Terminate Deadline]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employ Nunc Pro Tunc (CM41)]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Receipt]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Order (SA)]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees]
  • February 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • February 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Ch 11 (Corporation / Partnership) (BNC Notice)]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employ (CM41)]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Update Deadline (Ch 11 Small Business)]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Update Matrix]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Convert Case Utility]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief (Involuntary 11) (SA)]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral (CM04)]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Corporate Ownership]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Equity Security Holders]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion / Application]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Creditor Matrix (Only Use When PDF Image Omitted From Petition - Not An Amended Matrix)]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors (Form 104 & 204)]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Answer to Involuntary Petition (CM49-COAwith)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.