U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-00080
  • Case Name: Shawn Donovan Palazzotto
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Generic Motion]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines)]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Generic Motion]
  • January 08, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Setting Hearing (SA)]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Emergency/Ex parte Motion Referral]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Generic Motion / Application]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
  • August 01, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Withdrawal of Document / Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • July 18, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • June 17, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Generic Motion]
  • June 13, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of No Objection]
  • June 09, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Generic Motion / Application]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
  • July 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)]
April, 2021
  • April 24, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims]
  • April 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)]
  • April 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Approving Modification of Plan (BKPLAN05) (SA)]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Withdrawal of Document / Motion]
  • September 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)]
  • September 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certificate of No Objection]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Affidavit of Service]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Modified Plan (After Confirmation) (BKPLAN03)]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Modify Plan (After Confirmation)]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Forbearance (CARES ACT)]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
February, 2019
  • February 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Transfer of Claim Fee Paid]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13)]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certification of Domestic Support Payments]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Schedules A-J]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)]
  • March 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • March 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • March 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.