U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-00090
  • Case Name: Barry O Bunnell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines)]
May, 2018
  • May 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
  • May 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Dismissing Case (SA)]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo)]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [OSC Referral]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.