open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

ALASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:3:20-cv-00159
    Party Name:United States of America v. Noble
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:June 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:June 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Errata]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney ]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Substitute Attorney ]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
    Date Published:January 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:January 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:January 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
    Date Published:December 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:December 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Minute Entry]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:December 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:November 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:November 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing ]
    Date Published:November 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:October 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:October 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:October 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Unopposed Motion]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unopposed Motion]
    Date Published:September 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned]
    Date Published:September 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
    Date Published:August 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:August 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case]
    Date Published:August 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:August 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:August 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
    Date Published:August 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Services Report]
    Date Published:August 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:August 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:August 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:August 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
    Date Published:August 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:August 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Defendant in State Custody]
    Date Published:August 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - For Public]
    Date Published:August 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)]
    Date Published:August 23, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?60620
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =