open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:1:18-cr-00013-2
    Party Name:USA v. Dennis et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Declaration]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Expedite ]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendation (Final with No Initial R&R)]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Minute Entry]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Unopposed Motion]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unopposed Motion]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Passport Surrendered]
    Date Published:February 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appear]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Services Report]
    Date Published:January 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
    Date Published:December 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:December 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:December 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Arrest - Other District]
    Date Published:December 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Defendant in State Custody]
    Date Published:December 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
    Date Published:December 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Document]
    Date Published:December 19, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?61093
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =