open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Alaska

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:19-00004
    Party Name:Sharon Lou McIntire
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only)]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Petition Review Completed]
    Date Published:January 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Petition Review Completed]
    Date Published:January 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
    Date Published:January 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
    Date Published:January 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:January 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:January 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
    Date Published:January 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
    Date Published:January 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
    Date Published:January 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
    Date Published:January 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
    Date Published:January 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
    Date Published:January 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.akb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?31968
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =