open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Alaska

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:19-00005
    Party Name:Ricky D. Meredith, Jr. and Autumn E. Meredith
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:May 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:May 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Extend Entry of Discharge]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Defer Entry of Discharge (Do Not Use to Extend Discharge or Dischargeability Deadline)]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Update Matrix]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only)]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Schedules A-J]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration Regarding Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec or Form 202 )]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [OSC Referral]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Terminate Deadline]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Terminate Deadline]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Petition Review Completed]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Petition Review Completed]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.akb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?31969
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =