Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00002
    Party Name:Timothy et al v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:March 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Case Status Report Order]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:January 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service List]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?61203
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =