open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:4:19-cv-00002
    Party Name:Association of Village Council Presidents v. Newhouse & Vogler et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand to State Court]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service List]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?61198
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =