open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00162
    Party Name:Dunham v. Turnagain Marine Construction Corporation
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Case Status Report Order]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt For Non-Resident Attorney Fee]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation re Wrong Event Selected]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Unissued Summons]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?62079
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =