open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Alaska

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:19-00177
    Party Name:Garrett Bragg
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal]
    Date Published:July 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Dismissing Case (SA)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [OSC Referral]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Request for Special Notice]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Petition Review Completed]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.akb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?32147
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =