open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

ALASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:4:19-cr-00012-1
    Party Name:USA v. Estrada
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Criminal Judgment of Discharge]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate ]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - Request No Action]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appear]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Release]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Services Report]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Arrest - PC]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?62405
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =