open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

ALASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:4:19-cr-00011-1
    Party Name:USA v. Draveling
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Unopposed Motion]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Review Hearing]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Arrest]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [NotUsed V3 Sealed Motion '256']
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unopposed Motion]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing ]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appear]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Release]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Services Report]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Arrest - PC]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?62403
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =