open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

ALASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:3:19-cr-00084-1
    Party Name:USA v. Ilutsik
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Declaration]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?62415
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =