open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

ALASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00221
    Party Name:Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 341 v. Main Building Maintenance, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt For Non-Resident Attorney Fee]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Summons Issued]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Unissued Summons]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?62418
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =