open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Alaska

ALASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:19-00257
    Party Name:Gregory Ray Erbs
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certification of Domestic Support Payments]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Request for Special Notice]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Calendar Remark (Moot / Complied)]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Withdraw Document / Motion (MUST be Titled MOTION & submit an order - if not see Notice events)]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Document]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:August 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Request for Notice by Creditor]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Petition Review Completed]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.akb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?32228
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =